MIDDLETON-IN-TEESDALE COMMUNITY FITNESS SUITE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of exercise facilities via a fully equipped gymnasium and dedicated weights room. Weekly circuit training classes. All our activities are led by fully trained and qualified volunteers and promote health and general well being and social contact.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 14 November 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN BAINBRIDGE | Chair | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN STAFECKIS | Trustee | 06 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY DAWN WEET | Trustee | 22 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
NICKIE HOUGH | Trustee | 22 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
WENDY STAFECKIS | Trustee | 22 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM JOHN DERRICK WEET | Trustee | 22 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.29k | £86 | £2.68k | £2.70k | £3.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.32k | £5.26k | £4.64k | £4.04k | £4.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/10/2011 AS AMENDED ON 08/10/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MIDDLETON-IN-TEESDALE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY FITNESS SUITE AND GYM EQUIPMENT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Town End
Middleton-in-Teesdale
Barnard Castle
DL12 0SS
- Phone:
- 01833640109
- Email:
- ROSEMARY.WEET@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
middletongym.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window