Financial history THE YOUNG CHELSEA BRIDGE CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 1158813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2020 30/03/2021 30/03/2022 30/03/2023 30/03/2024
Total gross income £146.87k £98.81k £99.16k £120.01k £135.18k
Total expenditure £129.43k £66.53k £122.86k £113.37k £107.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £27.00k £10.14k N/A N/A