Financial history BRIDGE BUILDERS MENTORING

Charity number: 1158629
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/10/2019 01/10/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £4.93k £6.89k £58.20k £26.51k £1.96k
Total expenditure £3.92k £2.61k £15.77k £18.48k £97.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A