Financial history CALF HEATH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 504970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £7.54k £1.21k £5.24k £19.35k £32.89k
Total expenditure £14.26k £4.05k £7.03k £14.44k £19.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.00k