CALF HEATH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Calf Heath Village Hall seeks to provide a venue for events, meetings and for special functions such as weddings and birthday parties. A range of activities are regularly held for the local community. Fundraising events are supported to raise money for national and local charities. The hall Trustees' objectives are to maintain and upkeep the hall and to support worthy causes or charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £3,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 05 July 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Jackson | Trustee | 03 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE HICKMAN | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
CARON HACKETT | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.54k | £1.21k | £5.24k | £19.35k | £32.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.26k | £4.05k | £7.03k | £14.44k | £19.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 11 January 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 JANUARY 1976
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF HATHERTON AND SAREDON IN THE COUNTY OF STAFFORD WITHOUT DISTICTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF HATHERTON AND SAREDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Straight Mile
Calf Heath
Wolverhampton
WV10 7DW
- Phone:
- 07809466720
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window