PAGHAM FLOOD DEFENCE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds to protect people and property in Pagham and district from the danger of flooding.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 02 February 2015: Standard registration
- PFDT (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rupert Mussen | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor James Wood | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Christine Grace Henderson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Norton Huntley | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Mitchell Lee | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Michael Humphrey James | Trustee | 07 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Allen Miller | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Atkins | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MARIE FEAST | Trustee | 19 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.27k | £9.71k | £538.92k | £6.17k | £8.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | £22.71k | £83.59k | £747 | £65.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £538.89k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £28 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £510.62k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £75.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £8.59k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £75.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 JAN 2015 AS AMENDED ON 24 AUG 2016 AS AMENDED ON 29 APR 2022 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26 JAN 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY, THE PRESERVATION OF HUMAN LIFE AND PROPERTY AND FOR THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, TO PROVIDE, PRESERVE, MAINTAIN, RESTORE, AND/OR IMPROVE SEA DEFENCES AND FLOOD PROTECTION MEASURES IN THE AREA OF THE PARISH OF PAGHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Queensmead
BOGNOR REGIS
West Sussex
PO21 4UE
- Phone:
- 01243 266424
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window