HART (HAMPSHIRE ART FOR RECREATION AND THERAPY)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
hArt provides recreational and therapeutic opportunities for everyone to improve health and wellbeing through working with the creative arts. We also aim to reduce loneliness and isolation, and to encourage multigenerational interaction.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £12,110 from 3 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 October 2014: CIO registration
- 07 October 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
- 07 October 2024: Funds transferred to 1068710 CODA MUSIC AND ARTS TRUST
- HART (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £227.55k | £23.16k | £40.16k | £53.43k | £22.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.30k | £79.60k | £50.27k | £71.27k | £149.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.79k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.00k | £7.90k | £1.70k | £15.00k | £12.11k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 07 February 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 28 Oct 2014
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROMOTE, PRESERVE AND PROTECT PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH BY THE USE OF A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES AND ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (I) PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR PARTICIPATION IN CREATIVE PROJECTS; (II) ALLOWING THOSE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED OR ISOLATED TO ENJOY CONTACT THROUGH ARTS IN A SAFE ENVIRONMENT; (III) HELPING PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR CONFIDENCE AND RESILIENCE. 2. TO PROVIDE RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window