YELLOW BRICK ROAD PROJECTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of mentoring, life skills education and support for young people aged 10 - 35 to overcome barriers to secure housing and break the cycle of deprivation. Specialists in supporting young parents - 75% beneficiaries have one or children Helping young people with ACE's to recover and thrive You Matter programmes The Legacy Project Youth, schools and community work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
- Southampton City
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 04 February 2015: Standard registration
- 03 May 2016: Funds received from 1125062 HOME-START ANDOVER AND DISTRICT
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Milan Baxter | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Pilley | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Moulton | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
HELEN FOX | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Niyati Joshi | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.97k | £219.63k | £245.10k | £239.69k | £306.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.59k | £180.21k | £204.84k | £245.69k | £280.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.29k | £47.00k | N/A | £11.55k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 AUG 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02/02/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PARENTS AND PARENTS-TO-BE ("THE BENEFICIARIES") BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, ADVICE, EDUCATION AND TRAINING DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THE BENEFICIARIES’ CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND TO HELP THE BENEFICIARIES DEVELOP THEIR LIFE SKILLS, EMOTIONAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO ACTIVELY PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS THE CHARITY WILL: (I) ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR THE BENEFICIARIES BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, ADVICE, EDUCATION AND TRAINING RELATING TO LIFE SKILLS AS A MEANS OF HELPING THE BENEFICIARIES TO DEVELOP THEIR LIFE SKILLS, EMOTIONAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO ACTIVELY PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. (II) PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO PEOPLE TO ENABLE THEM TO HELP THE CHARITY IN PROVIDING SUPPORT, ADVICE, EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO THE BENEFICIARIES TO HELP THEM DEVELOP THEIR LIFE SKILLS, EMOTIONAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES. (III) WORK IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND BODIES TO HELP THE CHARITY IN PROVIDING SUPPORT, ADVICE, EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO THE BENEFICIARIES TO HELP THEM DEVELOP THEIR LIFE SKILLS, EMOTIONAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Former WRVS Building
Bentall Place
Suffolk Road
ANDOVER
Hampshire
- Phone:
- 01264360589
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window