HUMANE SLAUGHTER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The HSA is the only registered charity that works, in the UK and internationally, through educational, scientific and technical advances, exclusively towards the highest worldwide standards of welfare for food animals during transport, marketing, slaughter, and killing for disease control and welfare reasons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Brazil
- China
- New Zealand
- Scotland
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Sweden
- Switzerland
Governance
- 18 December 2014: CIO registration
- 24 November 2016: Funds received from 209563 THE HUMANE SLAUGHTER ASSOCIATION AND COUNCIL OF JU...
- HSA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Junqueira | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|||
Emma-Louise Singh | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|||
Dr Emily Craven | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|||
Dr Dorothy Elizabeth Fairlie McKeegan | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|||
Alison Enticknap | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|||
Dr Siobhan Abeysinghe | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|||
Jane Downes | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|||
Dr Anna Olsson | Trustee | 19 October 2016 |
|
|||
PROFESSOR RICHARD MARK BENNETT | Trustee | 15 October 2014 |
|
|||
DR DAVID RICHARD SARGAN MA | Trustee | 02 October 2012 |
|
|||
CORRIE LYNDIS MCCANN | Trustee | 11 October 2011 |
|
|||
DAVID GEORGE PRITCHARD | Trustee | 13 October 2010 |
|
|||
MICHAEL JOHN RADFORD OBE LLB | Trustee | 14 October 1998 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £323.98k | £495.75k | £297.49k | £495.16k | £388.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.33m | £504.71k | £384.18k | £452.52k | £507.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 18 Dec 2014
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE HUMANE TREATMENT OF ANIMALS OF A TYPE NORMALLY KEPT FOR AN AGRICULTURAL PURPOSE, AND SUCH OTHER ANIMALS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE, (A) DURING TRANSPORT; (B) IN LAIRAGE; (C) AT MARKET OR OTHERWISE WHILE BEING OFFERED FOR SALE; OR (D) AT THE TIME OF OR AT ANY OTHER STAGE IN THE SLAUGHTER OR KILLING PROCESS. 2. TO FURTHER THE PREVENTION OF SUFFERING OF SUCH ANIMALS IN THE SLAUGHTER AND KILLING PROCESS AND IMPROVE THEIR WELFARE BY:(A) SEEKING TO INTRODUCE REFORMS;(B) PROMOTING IMPROVED METHODS AND PRACTICES;(C) PROVIDING ADVICE, TRAINING, AND EDUCATION;(D) UNDERTAKING OR SUPPORTING RESEARCH; OR(E) SUCH OTHER METHODS AS THE TRUSTEES AGREE WILL FURTHER THIS PURPOSE. INTERPRETATION IN THIS CONSTITUTION THE FOLLOWING WORDS SHALL HAVE THE FOLLOWING MEANINGS: AGRICULTURAL PURPOSE: AN ANIMAL BRED, KEPT, OR KILLED FOR THE PRODUCTION OF FOOD, WOOL OR SKIN OR OTHER FARMING PURPOSES. AT THE TIME OF SLAUGHTER OR KILLING: THE PERIOD BETWEEN THE ANIMAL ARRIVING AT THE PREMISES WHERE IT IS TO BE KILLED AND THE TIME OF DEATH. WHERE THE ANIMAL IS NOT REMOVED TO A PARTICULAR PREMISES FOR THE PURPOSE OF BEING KILLED, THE RELEVANT PERIOD SHALL BE FROM THE TIME THAT PREPARATIONS TO KILL THE ANIMAL ARE COMMENCED AND THE TIME OF DEATH. MARKET: A MARKET PLACE OR SALE-YARD OR ANY OTHER PREMISES OR PLACE TO WHICH ANIMALS ARE BROUGHT FROM OTHER PLACES AND EXPOSED FOR SALE AND INCLUDES ANY LAIRAGE ADJOINING A MARKET. SLAUGHTER OR KILLING: THE KILLING OF AN ANIMAL BY ANY MEANS AND IN ANY CIRCUMSTANCES. TRANSPORT: THE CONVEYANCE OF AN ANIMAL BY WHATEVER MEANS, WHETHER FOR COMMERCIAL OR OTHER PURPOSE, AND INCLUDING THE COLLECTION, HANDLING, DRIVING, LOADING AND UNLOADING OF THE ANIMAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HUMANE SLAUGHTER ASSOCIATION
THE OLD SCHOOL
BREWHOUSE HILL
WHEATHAMPSTEAD
ST. ALBANS
AL4 8AN
- Phone:
- 01582831919
- Email:
- info@hsa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window