THE AARONSON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main way in which the charity pursues its charitable objectives is through the provision of grants to charitable and medical institutions and making medical research equipment available to medical researchers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
- Russia
- South Africa
- United States
Governance
- 27 November 2014: Standard registration
- THE LESLIE AND FREDA AARONSON FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL ARNOLD AARONSON | Chair | 28 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HOWARD RODNEY | Trustee | 28 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £163.51k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £283.47k | £122.41k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 JUL 2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/02/2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO PROVIDE A PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE FOLLOWING MANNER:- GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WHETHER BY MAKING GRANTS OR OTHERWISE AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FOLLOWING: PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS, FACILITIES AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND TO CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. RELIEF OF SICKNESS TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORK AND RECREATION. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH BY MAKING GRANTS AND PROVIDING ITEMS, FACILITIES AND SERVICES, FOR MEDICAL RESEARCH. ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL IN THE SUBJECT OF THE JEWISH RELIGION BY MAKING GRANTS TO INSTITUTIONS PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND EDUCATION OF THE JEWISH RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor Winston House
349 Regents Park Road
LONDON
N3 1DH
- Phone:
- 02034112001
- Email:
- david@mansionsco.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window