SOCIETY OF EVIDENCE BASED POLICING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sharing evidence base for crime prevention
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 September 2015: Standard registration
- SEBP (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Ruda | Chair | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Linton | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALEX MURRAY | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ben Linton | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £5.00k | £52.76k | £89.92k | £32.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £962 | £1.37k | £2.73k | £136.17k | £25.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 August 2023 | 195 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 March 2022 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30/07/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE POLICE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING AND FACILITATING: 1. INCREASED USE OF BEST AVAILABLE RESEARCH EVIDENCE TO SOLVE POLICING PROBLEMS; 2. THE PRODUCTION OF NEW RESEARCH EVIDENCE BY POLICE PRACTITIONERS AND RESEARCHERS AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH; 3. THE COMMUNICATION OF NEW RESEARCH EVIDENCE TO POLICE PRACTITIONERS AND THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
International House
101 King's Cross Road
LONDON
WC1X 9LP
- Phone:
- 07539296337
- Email:
- info@sebp.police.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window