TRANSCEND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and protect the good health of people with gender issues, including (but not limited to) people with gender variance or intersex conditions, their families and carers, in particular but not exclusively by developing and providing services and activities which provide information, advice and support and educate the public in the needs of people with gender issues.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Nov 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE WITH GENDER ISSUES, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) PEOPLE WITH GENDER VARIANCE OR INTERSEX CONDITIONS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY DEVELOPING AND PROVIDING SERVICES AND ACTIVITIES WHICH PROVIDE INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT AND EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH GENDER ISSUES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window