Financial history RYCROFT LEISURE

Charity number: 1157830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £240.11k £364.77k £247.51k £347.21k £344.83k
Total expenditure £231.81k £237.09k £235.33k £228.21k £337.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £121.98k £29.46k £16.72k £37.46k