RYCROFT LEISURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote community participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities for football, cricket, rugby, bowls, badminton, tennis, skate boarding and a fitness gym.To help young people from Havercroft and Ryhill area develop as individuals and members of society.Provision of facilities for recreation and other leisure time activities for the public at large in the interests of social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £37,462 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 14 July 2014: CIO registration
- 31 December 2019: Funds received from 523826 RYHILL AND HAVERCROFT JOINT RECREATION GROUND
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Booth | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Young | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angie Morley | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM SCOTT | Trustee | 14 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.11k | £364.77k | £247.51k | £347.21k | £344.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £231.81k | £237.09k | £235.33k | £228.21k | £337.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £121.98k | £29.46k | £16.72k | £37.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 Jul 2014
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE (A) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL , CRICKET, RUGBY, BOWLS, BADMINTON, TENNIS, SKATEBOARDING AND A FITNESS GYM; (B) TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE FROM RYHILL AND HAVERCROFT AND SURROUNDING AREAS, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY; (C) TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE N THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rycroft Leisure
The Sports & Youth Centre
Mulberry Avenue
Ryhill
Wakefield
WF4 2BB
- Phone:
- 01226723659
- Email:
- trading@rycroftleisure.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window