Financial history INTERNATIONAL SOCIOLOGY OF SPORT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1158978
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £43.62k £35.80k £31.69k £40.09k £43.58k
Total expenditure £30.61k £14.81k £28.51k £39.21k £43.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A