INTERNATIONAL SOCIOLOGY OF SPORT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organisation of the annual World Congress of the Sociology of Sport. The 2019 Congress was held in New Zealand. Publication of an international journal, the International Review for the Sociology of Sport.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- Chile
- New Zealand
Governance
- 27 October 2014: CIO registration
- ISSA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Parissa Safai PhD | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Alan Falcous PhD | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sun-Yong Kwon PhD | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Billy Graeff Bastos PhD | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Emmanuelle Tulle PhD | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helene Marie Charlotte Joncheray PhD | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
DR Michael Sam PhD | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.62k | £35.80k | £31.69k | £40.09k | £43.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.61k | £14.81k | £28.51k | £39.21k | £43.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 27 Oct 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION AND RESEARCH RELATED TO THE SOCIAL SIGNIFICANCE OF SPORT, EXERCISE AND PHYSICAL ACTIVITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wheelwright Cottage
Little Bristol Lane
Charfield
Wotton-under-Edge
GL12 8LL
- Phone:
- 07545330851
- Email:
- suejthorn@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window