PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF HOLY SAVIOUR BITTERNE

Charity Number: 1157949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious and outreach Activities to advance the Christian Faith in the area of benefit based in Bitterne Southampton. The PCC of Holy Saviour Bitterne, Charity No 1157949 supersedes Parish of Bitterne LEP, Charity No 1135147 which was dissolved in May 2014 and continues the work of advancing the Christian Faith in the area of benefit, The Parish of Bitterne in Southampton.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Southampton City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 July 2014: Previously excepted registration
  • 17 June 2015: Funds received from 1135147 THE PARISH OF BITTERNE LEP
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • PCC HOLY SAVIOUR BITTERNE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Antony PALMER Chair 11 January 2019
THE COURAGE FOUNDATION UK
Received: On time
Gareth WOOD Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Susan Ward Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Justine Boston Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Christopher HARRIS Professor Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Brian AYRES Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Fiona HUTCHINGS Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
James Roberts Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Susan BELL Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Joanne AYRES-PROCTOR Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Rebecca Ann BAILLIE Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Stephen SPENCER Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Roger MORAN Trustee 16 July 2018
None on record
Claire MOORE Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record
Amanda Jane WOOD Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record
Kevin SAWERS Trustee 26 April 2017
None on record
Kim BAILLIE Trustee 26 April 2017
None on record
Adrian David JACOBS Trustee 20 April 2016
None on record
ALISON JOAN LARGE Trustee 14 May 2014
None on record
Jane Elizabeth FISHER Trustee 14 May 2014
None on record
Brian Patrick GAFFNEY Trustee 14 May 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £654.97k £429.77k £270.81k £221.12k £776.31k
Total expenditure £208.53k £284.35k £420.97k £250.69k £795.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £90.11k £52.65k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.28m N/A N/A N/A £184.26k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £40.44k
Income - Endowments £7.57k N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A £7.14k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £544.48k
Income - Legacies £455.96k N/A N/A N/A £100
Expenditure - Charitable activities £208.53k N/A N/A N/A £795.02k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A £3.24k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A £22.23k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £439.93k N/A N/A N/A £1.11m
Long-term investments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Other assets £845.96k N/A N/A N/A £648.84k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities £7.32k N/A N/A N/A £529.74k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 07 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 November 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 November 2020 6 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Holy Saviour Church
Bursledon Road
Bitterne
SOUTHAMPTON
SO19 7LW
Phone:
023 8068 5560