COCOON FAMILY SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ACTIVITIES CURRENTLY SUSPENDED. To provide advice, information, support and counselling to families affected by perinatal mental health issues. To support those with lived experience to engage in coproduction and engagement processes to improve services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2018
Total income includes £22,420 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 October 2014: CIO registration
- SUPPORTING FAMILIES AFFECTED BY ANTENATAL AND POSTNATAL DEPRESSION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosie Lowman | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marie Louise Hurworth | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gabriella Bailey | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Lilienthal | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £937 | £20.79k | £19.02k | £32.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £563 | £4.70k | £11.68k | £31.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | £22.42k | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £9.97k | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 394 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 394 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 760 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 760 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1125 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1125 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1490 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1490 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 28 Oct 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AMONGST WOMEN SUFFERING FROM ANTENATAL OR POSTNATAL DEPRESSION AND THEIR FAMILIES IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT AND COUNSELLING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SIXTH FLOOR
3 Space
International House
6 Canterbury Crescent
LONDON
SW9 7QD
- Phone:
- 07500427122
- Email:
- info@cocoonfamilysupport.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window