ANGLESEY VINTAGE EQUIPMENT SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To foster and promote the education of the general public in the appreciation and practical study of the development and restoration of industrial agricultural, marine,commercial,military and domestic equipment and machinery. Regular meetings and activities are held including an annual rally
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Conwy
- Flintshire
- Gwynedd
- Isle Of Anglesey
- Powys
- Wrexham
Governance
- 29 October 2014: Standard registration
- 13 October 2016: Funds received from 511266 CYMDEITHAS HEN GELFI YNYS MON/ANGLESEY VINTAGE EQU...
- AVES; CYMDEITHAS HEN GELFI YNYS MON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Bruce Petrie | Chair | 05 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Horabin | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Louise Roberts | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Furnival | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek Hughes | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Owen Arfon Owen | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Patricia Wilkes | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Arnold Milburn | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
SARAH KERSEY Secretary | Trustee | 08 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
LLOYD PRITCHARD | Trustee | 08 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM DAVIES | Trustee | 08 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE PRITCHARD | Trustee | 08 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.04k | £1.27k | £1.88k | £66.79k | £63.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.97k | £5.54k | £6.35k | £37.78k | £47.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 December 2020 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 December 2020 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/10/2014
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION AND PRACTICAL STUDY OF THE DEVELOPMENT, PRESERVATION AND RESTORATION OF INDUSTRIAL, AGRICULTURAL, MARINE, COMMERCIAL AND DOMESTIC EQUIPMENT AND MACHINERY OF SOCIAL AND/OR HISTORICAL SIGNIFICANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pen Parc
Tyn Lon
HOLYHEAD
Gwynedd
LL65 3LJ
- Phone:
- 01407721082
- Email:
- annepwilkes@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window