Financial history BEACON CHURCH BRIDPORT

Charity number: 1161182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.15k £19.57k £66.93k £64.06k £82.74k
Total expenditure £25.04k £10.60k £13.24k £43.14k £57.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A