SIXTY-ONE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sixty-One is a partnership of Bristol based charities, churches, businesses and individuals who have come together to work co-operatively to help ex-prisoners lead meaningful lives that are free from crime. As charity in its own right it also runs its own projects through employed staff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
233 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 20 November 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW STREET | Chair | 20 November 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Kendia Rebecca Christodoulou | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Folake Mobolati Adekola | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Luke Hunka | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
ANDREW SIMON WOOD | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Sandra Sykes | Trustee | 19 August 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
PAUL HEDLEY TIPLER | Trustee | 20 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
JOHN EDWARD BARNETT | Trustee | 20 November 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £196.58k | £168.60k | £173.57k | £243.39k | £255.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.88k | £154.53k | £184.82k | £215.84k | £246.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 20 Nov 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED OR HARDSHIP IN BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING REGION AND IN PARTICULAR PRISONERS, EX-PRISONERS AND THOSE WHO ARE AT RISK OF ENTERING THE PRISON SYSTEM BY (IN EACH CASE IN WAYS WHICH ARE CONSISTENT WITH PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH): PROVIDING AND FINANCING A MENTORING SERVICE TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS IN DEVELOPING SKILLS TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION; AND PROMOTING AND FINANCING SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SEE FIT IN ORDER TO RELIEVE SUCH PERSONS FROM HARDSHIP AND TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sixty-One
c/o St Agnes Church
Thomas Street
BRISTOL
BS2 9LL
- Phone:
- 01174037905
- Email:
- info@sixty-one.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window