SERIOUS FUN CHILDREN'S NETWORK INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 1158846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Serious Fun Children's Network International is a UK-based children's charity and a member of the international SeriousFun Children's Network, Inc. The aim of the charity is to raise funds in the UK / Europe that will be used to support camps that are affiliated with the SeriousFun Children's Network. These camps are based around the world and provide services for children with serious illness.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £6,598
Total expenditure: £8,623

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 October 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SFCNI (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD TWYDELL Chair 23 May 2014
None on record
Deirdre Ahearn Trustee 07 December 2020
None on record
Justin Fusaro Trustee 07 December 2020
None on record
JEFFREY BLAKE MAHER Trustee 10 September 2016
None on record
JOSEPH CRONLY Trustee 13 June 2014
THE KENNEDY TRUST FOR RHEUMATOLOGY RESEARCH
Received: On time
KEVIN MATHIESON Trustee 13 June 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £152.21k £364.27k £340.58k £339.62k £6.60k
Total expenditure £164.77k £351.66k £245.78k £426.47k £8.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Tanglemere
Holly Hill Lane
Sarisbury Green
SOUTHAMPTON
SO31 7AH
Phone:
07711584676
Website:

No information available