Financial history THE JANE METSON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1158343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.40k £11.09k £5.91k £5.93k £6.55k
Total expenditure £45.11k £7.30k £10.28k £6.04k £6.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A