CRAWLEY DOWN VILLAGE SCHOOL FRIENDS OF & PARENTS ASSOCIATION (T/A FUNDRAISING TEAM)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are the fund raising team of a local village school. We (a small group of local parents/grandparents) run events like summer and Christmas fairs, school discos, secret shops and movie nights to raise money for our school to cover the vital items that government school funding does not cover.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 26 May 2015: Standard registration
- FUNDRAISING TEAM (Working name)
- CRAWLEY DOWN VILLAGE SCHOOL FUNDRAISING TEAM (Previous name)
- CRAWLEY DOWN VILLAGE SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION (AKA THE FUNDRAISING TEAM) (Previous name)
- THE FUNDRAISING TEAM (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Walls | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Wheaton | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Grant | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Beckett | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.49k | £12.58k | £16.46k | £19.34k | £20.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.16k | £5.63k | £24.85k | £26.69k | £7.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/06/2009 AS AMENDED ON 02/02/2015 as amended on 12 Apr 2021 as amended on 12 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: - DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; - ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 The Furrows
Crawley Down
CRAWLEY
West Sussex
RH10 4ZT
- Phone:
- 07736311471
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window