Trustees 1ST LARCH FARM SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 504994

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER HADLEY | Chair | 04 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Adam Beadsmoore | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Robinson | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Berry | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Hayes | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Warden | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Shardlow | Trustee | 27 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Karen Peel | Trustee | 18 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.