NORTH WORCESTERSHIRE LIFE GUARD CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO TEACH AND TRAIN LIFESAVING SKILLS AND AWARDS FOR COMPETITION AND DOMESTIC USE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Dudley
- Sandwell
Governance
- 24 March 1976: Standard registration
- NWLC - LIFESAVERS (Working name)
- NWLC LIFESAVERS (Working name)
- NWLGC (Working name)
- NORTH WORCESTERSHIRE LIFE GUARD CORPS (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR NIC PENN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JUNE WEBB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE PENN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.30k | £5.07k | £4.33k | £8.68k | £7.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.00k | £3.29k | £3.64k | £7.34k | £5.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 09 January 2025 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 25 February 2023 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 11 December 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED ON 23 JANUARY 1976 AND AMENDED 27 JANUARY 1978, 25 JANUARY 1980, 30 JANUARY 1987 AND 5 APRIL 1993
Charitable objects
TO UPHOLD WHERE POSSIBLE THE AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF THE R.L.S.S. BY PROVIDING; I) AN EFFICIENT LIFEGUARD COVER FOR SAFER INDOOR AND OUTDOOR BATHING AS REQUESTED BY RECOGNISED BODIES. II) THE TEACHING OF LIFESAVING. III) THE PROMOTION OF INTEREST BY COMPETITIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 HERONDALE ROAD
STOURBRIDGE
DY8 3LQ
- Phone:
- 01384392761
- Email:
- janepenn@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window