GHANA UNION MIDLANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main function of Ghana Union are: Bring together the various Ghanaian unions, associations and other groups under one regional umbrella body, and to foster good relationships and understanding amongst the various groups which support the Ghanaian community in the Midlands Offer support and advice on management, financial management ,funding,,governance and consultancy to its member
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Derby City
- Dudley
- Leicester City
- Northamptonshire
- Nottingham City
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 27 February 2015: Standard registration
- GUM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr QUAYE BOTCHWAY | Chair | 24 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Emmanuel Asante - Odame ACCA | Trustee | 30 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER KENNEDY AMOH | Trustee | 24 January 2015 |
|
|||||
KWASI ASIEDU-OFEI | Trustee | 24 January 2015 |
|
|||||
ADJE WILSON | Trustee | 24 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.89k | £23.03k | £6.28k | £5.69k | £7.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.39k | £28.42k | £6.54k | £5.25k | £7.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £18.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 AUG 2014 AS AMENDED ON 25/01/2015
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF ETHNIC AND CULTURAL VALUES THROUGH A VEHICLE FOR EXPLORING, LEARNING, RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY, AND PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND BY RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; 3) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, PREVENTING THEM FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY; 4) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGED IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. 5) TO PREVENT OR MINIMISE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO PROMOTE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC WELL BEING SO AS TO SUPPORT THE VULNERABLE PEOPLE IN THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
101 WOODSIDE AVENUE SOUTH
COVENTRY
CV3 6BL
- Phone:
- 07904090878
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window