NORTHERN LIGHTS CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance religion in the provision and maintaining of places of worship, and to provide better understanding of Christ's Gospel. The provision of spiritual advice and counselling, reaching out to the unfortunate and needy within the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Calderdale
Governance
- NLC (Working name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN WARREN | Chair | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Lovell | Trustee | 08 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Armour | Trustee | 08 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Armour | Trustee | 08 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Thompson | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Lee Warren | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.22k | £43.57k | £36.50k | £48.32k | £48.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.21k | £42.61k | £54.21k | £51.69k | £48.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.77k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 08 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 08 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 SEP 2013 AS AMENDED ON 20/04/2014
Charitable objects
4.3.1. ADVANCING RELIGION IN THE PROVISION AND MAINTAINING PLACES OF WORSHIP AND PROVIDING BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF CHRIST'S GOSPEL THAT ALL PEOPLE ARE INVITED TO PARTICIPATE IN SALVATION, WORSHIP AND THE EXPECTING SIGNS FOLLOWING ACCORDING TO THE NORMAL NEW TESTAMENT PATTERN AND OUR ARTICLES OF FAITH (MARK 16:15-20). ACTIVITIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS WILL INCLUDE: · PROVIDING SPIRITUAL ADVICE AND COUNSELLING. · OUT REACHING TO THE UNFORTUNATE AND NEEDY OF THE COMMUNITY AS WELL AS SUPPORTING THE COHESION OF SOCIETY BY MINISTERING DIRECTLY TO WHATEVER DEFINABLE SEGMENT OF SOCIETY THE CHURCH MAY BE ABLE TO, WHETHER BY GENDER, AGE, RELIGIOUS OR CULTURAL BACK GROUND, OR SOCIO-ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, LANGUAGE, OR ANY DISADVANTAGED OR DISABLED IT MAY BE ABLE TO ASSIST WITH; · PLANTING, AND AIDING TO BE PLANTED, CHARITABLE CHRIST-CENTRED CHURCHES THAT ARE ABLE TO BECOME AUTONOMOUS, INTERDEPENDENT AND SELF-PROPAGATING CHARITABLE CENTRES OF WORSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, TO THE BETTERMENT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY IN THE DEVELOPING OF GREATER MAGNANIMITY, AS WELL AS TO THE BENEFIT OF THE PLACES OUTREACHED TO (ACTS 14:21-28)
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 McCrea Apartments
Emily Way
Halifax
HX1 2NS
- Phone:
- 01422706106
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window