Financial history SHROPSHIRE STREET CATS

Charity Number: 1159062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £26.21k £34.14k £26.01k £23.34k £39.13k
Total expenditure £17.22k £32.45k £25.39k £24.21k £23.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A