Trustees FENSTANTON VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Charity number: 1159392

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Mead | Chair | 01 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN FORBES-MITCHELL | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Mustill | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Tevlin | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Hewitt | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA SUZANNE BATCHELOR | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROY MCGEE | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hunt | Trustee | 13 March 2017 |
|
|||||
TRACEY JANE JACOB | Trustee | 12 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
COLIN MACRAE SAUNDERSON | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MARY ANDREWS | Trustee | 01 April 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.