PENCOMBE AND LITTLE COWARNE PARISH HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide and maintain a hall for community use in the village of Pencombe for the villages of Pencombe and Little Cowarne. The hall may also be let to be used by others when it is free.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 25 March 1976: Standard registration
- PENCOMBE & LITTLE COWARNE PARISH HALL (Working name)
- PENCOMBE PARISH HALL (Previous name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tim Mobey | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Amy Brazier | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Ruth Hodges | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
'Frank' Albert Francis Nicholson | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Legge | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Drew | Trustee | 12 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emily Louise Barrett | Trustee | 12 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Colin Hadley | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.54k | £21.13k | £18.50k | £13.24k | £16.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.23k | £11.13k | £22.81k | £15.18k | £15.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.23k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 September 2024 | 222 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 February 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 29 JANUARY 1976 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17 DECEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF PENCOMBE AND LITLE COWARNE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PENCOMBE AND LITTLE COWARNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parish Hall
Pencombe
Bromyard
HR7 4SH
- Phone:
- 01885 400311
- Email:
- palcph@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window