THE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Enhancing Sheffield Children's NHS Foundation Trust and its reputation as a centre of excellence for the care, prevention & cure of illnesses. Specifically funding: Research into children's illnesses; New facilities to extend the range of treatment provided ; Specialist medical equipment to enhance the care programme of the Trust; Improving the environment for our patients, families and visitors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£4,009,984
Donations and legacies | £3.02m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £687.34k | |
Investments | £300.77k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£7,036,338
Raising funds | £1.70m | |
Charitable activities | £5.31m | |
Other | £27.35k |
£133,397 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.72m | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.31m |
People

30 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- SHEFFIELD CHILDRENS HOSPITAL CHARITY (Working name)
- THE CHILDRENS APPEAL (Working name)
- SHEFFIELD CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL CENTENARY APPEAL LIMITED (Previous name)
- SHEFFIELD CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL CHARITY (Previous name)
- THE CHRIS FUND LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Neil McMahon | Chair | 31 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Charlotte Acevedo | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Dawn Lumley | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Currie | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam James Gillett | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Conway Hartland | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Mark Andrew Rooker | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Evelyn White | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Brown | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Professor Cynthia Nwamaka Offiah | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Barnett | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.80m | £3.13m | £5.14m | £4.09m | £4.01m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.15m | £1.90m | £3.11m | £3.50m | £7.04m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £125.22k | £22.42k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.95m | £2.82m | £3.82m | £3.42m | £3.02m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £793.14k | £133.62k | £1.32m | £532.99k | £687.34k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £60.69k | £53.65k | £6.45k | £131.53k | £300.77k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £125.22k | £2.42k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £432.09k | £445.92k | £1.02m | £581.55k | £631.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £864.97k | £862.98k | £1.59m | £2.02m | £5.31m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.28m | £1.02m | £1.50m | £1.45m | £1.70m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.95k | £5.12k | £25.69k | £5.82k | £8.72k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £830.82k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £11.57k | £27.34k | £27.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £11.72k | £11.96k | £11.57k | £27.34k | £27.35k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £613.35k | £576.51k | £544.48k | £526.34k | £497.19k | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.08m | £2.25m | £3.77m | £6.10m | £6.26m | |
|
Other assets | £6.06m | £8.22m | £9.25m | £7.22m | £3.39m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.11m | £2.05m | £2.50m | £2.46m | £1.65m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 SEPTEMBER 1975 AS AMENDED 18 DECEMBER 1975, 26 NOVEMBER 1981, 29 JULY 1983, CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION 18 AUGUST 2004, CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30 SEPT 2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 JUL 2016 as amended on 15 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
2.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND IN PARTICULAR: A. TO ENHANCE THE SERVICES, FACILITIES AND ENVIRONMENT OF THE FOUNDATION TRUST AND ITS REPUTATION AS A CENTRE OF EXCELLENCE FOR THE CARE, PREVENTION AND CURE OF ILLNESSES AFFECTING CHILDREN; B. TO FURTHER ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE GENERAL OR ANY SPECIFIC PURPOSES OF THE FOUNDATION TRUST OR THE PURPOSES OF THE HEALTH SERVICE; C. TO PROMOTE, PROTECT, PRESERVE AND ADVANCE ALL OR ANY ASPECTS OF THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC; AND D. TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE AND EDUCATION IN MEDICINE INCLUDING BY ENGAGING IN AND SUPPORTING MEDICAL RESEARCH (AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS).” PROVIDED THAT SUCH SUPPORT IS NOT OF A KIND THAT WOULD ORDINARILY BE GIVEN BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHILDRENS HOSPITAL NHS TRUST
WESTERN BANK
SHEFFIELD
S10 2TH
- Phone:
- 01143212470
- Email:
- support@tchc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window