ROAD LOCOMOTIVE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society has since 1937 recorded for public benefit the history of all types of self propelled road steam engines - traction engines,road rollers, wagons and portable engines - made, used or preserved in the UK. It maintains an extensive record of owners and manufacturers production, photographs, books and literature and publishes a quarterly journal.Public reference may be made to the records.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 November 2014: CIO registration
- 06 June 2016: Funds received from 1102574 THE ROAD LOCOMOTIVE SOCIETY
- RLS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Wakeham | Chair | 19 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hedd Wyn Jones | Trustee | 26 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Baines | Trustee | 26 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jonathan Abbott | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
EVELYN CLARE BULLEN | Trustee | 29 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JOHN CAUDWELL | Trustee | 24 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW NICHOLAS WELLS | Trustee | 09 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gary Wragg | Trustee | 09 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN JOHNSON | Trustee | 09 April 2015 |
|
|||||
TREVOR ROSS SMALLBONE | Trustee | 09 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHELE GODDARD BENG | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW SMITH | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.54k | £36.71k | £27.53k | £42.90k | £43.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.72k | £17.48k | £18.34k | £18.22k | £21.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 27 Nov 2014
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH INTO THE HISTORY OF ALL TYPES OF SELF PROPELLED STEAM ENGINES (OTHER THAN THOSE RUNNING ON RAILS) AND THOSE TYPES OF STATIONARY STEAM ENGINES KNOWN AS PORTABLE ENGINES BUILT, USED OR PRESERVED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nonsuch Nurseries
Westbrook
Bromham
Chippenham
SN15 2ED
- Phone:
- 07792136877
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window