ROMANIAN RESCUE APPEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Romanian rescue appeal have now built three dog shelters in Romania. The charity cares for nine hundred dogs split into different localities, who we rescued from abuse, malnutrition, homelessness or imminent euthanasia via barbaric methods.. The charity run spay and neuter campaigns and have a programme for UK volunteers to visit all of the sites in Romania.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Stockport
- Romania
Governance
- 24 March 2015: CIO registration
- RRA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JO FOWLES | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alex Marinkovic Svetelj | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dee Wells | Trustee | 11 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2018 | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £258.92k | £479.42k | £499.39k | £431.56k | £309.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £343.26k | £459.48k | £447.21k | £364.10k | £275.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 59 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 59 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 424 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 424 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 04 May 2022 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 04 May 2022 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS DOGS IN ROMANIA BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR DOGS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO DOG WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG DOGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3rd Floor
166 Upper Richmond Road
LONDON
SW15 2SH
- Phone:
- 00000000000
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window