UP & DOWNS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Up and Downs is a friendly support group, supporting children with Downs Syndrome and their families based in the West Midlands. The group is affiliated with the Downs Syndrome Association. The group holds monthly meetings for children with Downs Syndrome of all ages and their families, including siblings. The group has been welcoming new families for several years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 06 November 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charmaine Nicholls | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Hughes | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Wilson | Trustee | 06 November 2014 |
|
|||||
JEMMA SAGAR | Trustee | 06 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.51k | £28.67k | £10.23k | £11.51k | £21.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.10k | £23.55k | £15.21k | £16.71k | £25.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 06 Nov 2014
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DOWN'S SYNDROME BY THE PROVISION FOR SUCH PEOPLE OF FACILITIES, SERVICES AND OPPORTUNITIES THAT WILL MAXIMISE THEIR PARTICIPATION IN SOCIETY THEIR EDUCATION AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH DOWN'S SYNDROME WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 King Charles Road
Halesowen
B62 0DP
- Phone:
- 07875031085
- Email:
- jemma@upanddowns.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window