THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD, THANKSGIVING HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES a) the prevention or relief of poverty; b) the advancement of education; c) the advancement of religion; d) the advancement of citizenship or community development; e) the relief of those in need, by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 August 2014: Standard registration
- RCCG THANKSGIVING HOUSE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLUGBENGA EMMANUEL ADEKUNLE DARAMOLA | Trustee | 24 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
ADEYEMI MUHAMMAD ASEKUN | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr ADAEZE CHINEYE NSOEDO KALU | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.22k | £27.15k | £19.45k | £14.15k | £11.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.46k | £31.16k | £13.72k | £12.08k | £11.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 October 2024 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/06/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") WHICH ARE TO BE CARRIED OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE: THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE; AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 MENISH WAY
CHELMSFORD
CM2 6RT
- Phone:
- 07809729968
- Email:
- thanksgivinghouse@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window