COMMUNITY OF TIGRAYAN IN THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
* Advice, support and advocacy on welfare benefits, education, training and employment etc. * Female and young people training and development programmes * Health development programmes * Job search and business start up * Provide courses such as English, IT, web-design etc. * Organise social and cultural event * Supplementary classes, and homework club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 October 2014: CIO registration
- CTG-UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yalemzewed Abraha | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Abraham Mebrahtu | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Netsanet Gebru | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
HASSAN ROBLE | Trustee | 27 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
SIMON HAYELOM | Trustee | 27 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
HABTOM ZERU | Trustee | 27 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
HIWOT ROBINS | Trustee | 19 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Henoke Daniel | Trustee | 19 January 2018 |
|
|||||
BERHANE GEBRU | Trustee | 15 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mulat Haregot | Trustee | 18 May 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.88k | £42.17k | £9.19k | £25.99k | £1.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.89k | £21.81k | £16.28k | £15.18k | £15.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £23.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 03 Oct 2014 as amended on 15 Jul 2019 as amended on 28 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
(1) The relief of poverty, sickness and distress and the advancement of education, particularly among persons of the community of Tigrayan now living in the UK. (2) To provide or assist in the provision of facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals who have need of such facilities by reason of their youth, age infirmity or disability, financial hardship or social circumstances with the object of improving their conditions of life. (3) To promote social inclusion of persons of the community of Tigrayans now living in the UK by preventing them from becoming socially excluded, relieving the needs of those people who are socially excluded and assisting them to integrate in society. (4) To act as a resource for young people, particular from the community of Tigrayans, by providing advice, assistance and organising programmes of physical, educational and other activities as a means of advancing in life and helping such young people by developing their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to fully participate in society as independent, mature and responsible individuals.' (5) The advancement of environmental protection or improvement in Tigray by working closely with local, national, regional, and international governmental, and non-government organisations and agencies. (6) Providing support to organisations who are working to build a strong anti - poverty network in the Tigray regional state and to support the development programmes in Tigray to promote social justice with the objective to combat poverty.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13-15 STOCKWELL ROAD
LONDON
SW9 9AU
- Phone:
- 02036200764
- Email:
- info@ctguk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window