ALSTROM SYNDROME EUROPE

Charity number: 1160362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Alstrom Syndrome Europe is a network of medical and scientific professionals from across the EU working to educate and share information and promote research into the many complex aspects of the ultra rare disease Alstrom Syndrome. The medical professionals work with affected patients in their respective countries and liaise with patient groups.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £732

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Austria
  • Belgium
  • Cyprus
  • Denmark
  • Finland
  • France
  • Germany
  • Greece
  • Hungary
  • Italy
  • Netherlands
  • Norway
  • Portugal
  • Spain
  • Sweden
  • Switzerland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 February 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • AS EU (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR MAFFEI Chair 02 July 2014
None on record
Bernd Rosenbichler Trustee 28 January 2025
None on record
Kerry Leeson-Beevers Trustee 01 July 2024
CILIOPATHY ALLIANCE
Received: On time
Dr SELMA DUZENLI Trustee 09 November 2017
None on record
Professor Diana Valverde Trustee 10 January 2016
None on record
DR HIWOT Trustee 02 July 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £300 £645 £63 £732 £732
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 14 May 2024 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 St. Kitts Close
TORQUAY
TQ2 7GD
Phone:
07970071675