Accounts and annual returns THE PRI 2 MERCIAN REGIMENT

Charity number: 1158358
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 December 2022 15 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 December 2022 15 March 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 July 2020 On Time