WESLEY HOUSE, CAMBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wesley House is a theological college for Methodist students in Cambridge and a member of the Cambridge Theological Federation. It has redeveloped itself as a postgraduate college with an international focus which offers a place for students to live, pray and study together in a Wesleyan community of theological thinkers and practitioners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£979,366
Donations and legacies | £59.97k | |
Charitable activities | £614.85k | |
Other trading activities | £256.05k | |
Investments | £48.50k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,486,713
Raising funds | £2.69k | |
Charitable activities | £1.30m | |
Other | £182.50k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £185.19k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.30m |
People

14 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Kenya
- United States
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 03 September 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Elliott | Chair | 12 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Helen Hollands | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher David Roles | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rose Westwood | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR Nigel David Poole | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|||||
JANET ARTHUR | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|||||
David Peniket | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Stephen Burgess | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH HELEN OVEY | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.22m | £1.14m | £955.78k | £1.02m | £979.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £768.47k | £823.65k | £1.13m | £1.24m | £1.49m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £575.04k | £541.88k | £45.53k | £139.03k | £59.97k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £16.06k | £3.20k | £78.09k | £181.08k | £256.05k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £624.91k | £588.91k | £832.06k | £691.11k | £614.85k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.79k | £2.29k | £97 | £9.23k | £48.50k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £411.38k | £0 | £0 | £2.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £727.68k | £799.28k | £986.85k | £1.15m | £1.30m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £4.91k | £13.93k | £6.82k | £2.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £6.52k | £6.44k | £6.15k | £10.07k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £40.79k | £19.46k | £126.88k | £79.56k | £182.50k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £10.08m | £10.53m | £10.43m | £10.38m | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £10.32m | |
|
Other assets | £1.43m | £1.25m | £1.15m | £1.28m | £1.10m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £417.43k | £372.14k | £340.76k | £637.68k | £640.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 JUL 2014 AS AMENDED ON 06 MAY 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 JUL 2022 as amended on 14 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
4. Objects 4.1. The object of the Company is the advancement of education and the Christian faith in particular by establishing and maintaining a college, hostel or institution within the precincts of the University of Cambridge which provides: 4.1.1. training in theology and formation in a Wesleyan tradition for accepted candidates for the ministry and ordained ministers of the Methodist Church worldwide; and 4.1.2. theological training to lay members of the Methodist Church worldwide; and 4.1.3. theological training to others consistently with the values of the Methodist and Wesleyan traditions by means of tuition, academic supervision and mentoring (including by remote means) together with residential facilities in connection with such tuition, supervision and mentoring, where appropriate. 4.2. The Company shall function as a post-graduate college enabling students to have access, as appropriate, to the benefits of University life and tuition, and applicants shall normally be required to hold an undergraduate degree (or equivalent) prior to being granted access to residence and/or tuition in the college, save that the Trustees shall have discretion to permit access to such number and proportion of students who do not already hold an undergraduate degree as they see fit.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESLEY HOUSE
JESUS LANE
CAMBRIDGE
CB5 8BJ
- Phone:
- 01223765850
- Email:
- aio22@cam.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window