ERICA LAWSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of current and former Israeli soldiers and their families, including the widows of Israeli soldiers who have died in the course of their service, who are conditions of need due to their poverty or financial hardship, sickness, disability or other disadvantage through the provision of grants to individuals in need and/or charities or other organisations working to relieve such needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 01 December 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Alexander Godsall | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Ying Ying Lim | Trustee | 25 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cy Williams | Trustee | 25 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony William de Cruz | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Williams | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/07/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £7.88m | £113.00k | £121.47k | £164.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.17k | £240.85k | £221.64k | £200.85k | £266.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £7.85m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £24.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £7.85m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £240.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £12.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 July 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25/11/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (“THE OBJECTS”) ARE: THE RELIEF OF CURRENT AND FORMER ISRAELI SOLDIERS AND THEIR FAMILIES, INCLUDING THE WIDOWS OF ISRAELI SOLDIERS WHO HAVE DIED IN THE COURSE OF THEIR SERVICE, WHO ARE CONDITIONS OF NEED DUE TO THEIR POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS, DISABILITY OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO RELIEVE SUCH NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIRST FLOOR
67 Victoria Road
HORLEY
RH6 7QH
- Phone:
- 01293521191
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window