CENTRAL CU TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the development and delivery of out-of-school hours learning activities for children, of all abilities, aged 5-14 in the Midlands region.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Herefordshire
- Solihull
- Warwickshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 20 January 2015: Standard registration
- 21 February 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CENTRAL CHILDREN'S UNIVERSITY TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.62k | £59.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.83k | £59.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 31 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 31 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 APR 2013
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE FOR THE EDUCATION, CARE AND RECREATION OF CHILDREN OF SCHOOL AGE BY MAKING FACILITIES, SUPPORT AND SERVICES AVAILABLE TO THEM, ESPECIALLY DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS; 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES, SUPPORT AND SERVICES; 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS INVOLVED IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH EDUCATION, CARE AND RECREATION, INCLUDING PARENT CARERS AND MENTORS; AND 4. TO FURTHER ANY OTHER PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window