OPEN CULTURE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support art and culture projects. Help members of the art community organise exhibitions and educational work. Raising awareness to environmental issues. It is about sustainability and climate changing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 September 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NATALIYA RESH | Chair | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Vladislav Plyushchenko | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tamara Rosenberg | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2019 | 30/08/2020 | 30/08/2021 | 30/08/2022 | 30/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.02k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | 18 July 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | 18 July 2021 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Sep 2014
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC:- 1.TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS BY:- (A)ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A MUSEUM AND / OR ART GALLERY; (B)OPENING AND CONDUCTING ART EXHIBITIONS WITH FREE PUBLIC ADMISSIONS; (C)ARRANGING CULTURAL EXCHANGES BETWEEN THE UK AND OTHER CULTURAL CAPITALS; AND (D)PUBLISHING AND DISSEMINATING ART LITERATURE, BROCHURES, EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS AND CATALOGUES FOR EVENTS AND EXHIBITIONS IN LONDON; (E)MAKING GRANTS TO STUDENTS TO FURTHER THEIR STUDIES IN ART; AND 2.TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF ARTISTIC, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A)ADVANCING THEM IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B)ADVANCING EDUCATION IN THE ARTS; (C)RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; AND (D)PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS; AND 3.TO SUPPORT SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 9
Burnham Court
Moscow Road
LONDON
W2 4SW
- Phone:
- 07784118405
- Email:
- nr@open-culture.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window