WESTWOOD PARISH ROOM CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To manage and maintain Westwood Parish Room as a Village Hall for the wholesome benefit of the residents of Westwood in the County of Wiltshire and the surrounding area. To ensure through income from letting and volunteer activites that the property remains functional, safe and attractive for all users while maintaining sufficient balance in the accounts to allow for emergencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 28 May 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Alexander Hunter | Chair | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Patrick Crawford | Trustee | 06 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
BELINDA LAWRIE | Trustee | 22 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Philpott | Trustee | 22 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER EDWARDS | Trustee | 06 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.19k | £25.76k | £15.63k | £10.04k | £12.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.32k | £4.65k | £23.06k | £20.54k | £20.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.36k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 28 May 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1)TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE PARISH OF WESTWOOD IN WILTSHIRE AND IN SO FAR AS THE PROPERTY IS NOT REQUIRED TO BE USED FOR THIS PURPOSE IT MAY BE USED FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSE: 2)THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WESTWOOD IN WILTSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Westwood Parish Rooms
Lower Westwood
BRADFORD-ON-AVON
BA15 2AF
- Phone:
- 01225869006
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window