BISHOPTHORPE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bishopthorpe Preschool Playgroup caters for children aged 3 - 4 within Bishopthorpe. Our team of staff and committee work together to ensure that all children and their families are supported and happy. We offer a caring, exciting and stimulating environment for the children to learn and develop at their own pace. We also offer Forest School sessions and have excellent links with the local school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £100,930 from 1 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- City Of York
Governance
- 03 December 2014: CIO registration
- 16 February 2021: Funds received from 1020793 BISHOPTHORPE PRE SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Chapman | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Woodings | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Morris | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.94k | £85.67k | £55.22k | £89.00k | £128.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.62k | £94.68k | £71.45k | £81.60k | £108.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £85.57k | £74.82k | £37.71k | £65.40k | £100.93k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £779 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 16 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 16 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 July 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 July 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 31 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 31 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 03 Dec 2014
Charitable objects
THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: (1)PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; (2)PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; (3)PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; (4)PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; (5)PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO; AND (6)FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Pavilion.
Ferry Lane
BISHOPTHORPE
YORK
YO23 2SB
- Phone:
- 07722046184
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window