DIVINE MERCY HOME (DMH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is established to empower young people in need and vulnerable adults of the African community in the London Borough of Bexley, surrounding areas, the UK and Africa to lead a normal life, to protect and preserve public health by the provision of HIV/AIDS and sexual health prevention services to the African community in the London Borough of Bexley, surrounding areas, the UK and Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bexley
- Bromley
- City Of London
- Croydon
- Greenwich
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Rwanda
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- Uganda
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 05 March 2015: Standard registration
- DMH (Working name)
- DIVINE MERCY HOME (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MARTINA CHANGWEREZA | Chair | 19 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62 | £400 | £405 | £425 | £415 | |
|
Total expenditure | £31 | £389 | £399 | £420 | £411 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 March 2025 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2025 | 414 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 March 2025 | 779 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 March 2025 | 1144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1557 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1557 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/08/2013 AS AMENDED ON 07/02/2015
Charitable objects
TO ALLEVIATE THE SUFFERING OF PERSONS SUBJECT TO OR AFFECTED BY HIV/AIDS, AND TO PROMOTE SEXUAL HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR WITH A FOCUS ON MEMBERS OF THE AFRICAN COMMUNITY, IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BEXLEY, SURROUNDING AREAS, THE UK, ZAMBIA AND OTHER AFRICAN COUNTRIES BY PROVIDING TRAINING, SUPPORT, AND INFORMATION ABOUT MAKING INFORMED HEALTH CHOICES AND BY PROVIDING PERSON-CENTRED HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE SERVICES TO VULNERABLE ADULTS AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEED. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF HIV/AIDS AND ITS PREVENTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 OAKMERE ROAD
LONDON
SE2 0XX
- Phone:
- 07874708151
- Email:
- dmhcharity@gmail.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window