THE HOPE PROGRAMME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Telephone supportline, advice, counselling, coaching, protective behaviours & referrals to other agencies, for people over 10 years who have suffered rape & any other form of sexual violence at any time of their lives, The aim is to help them to cope & recover from the aftermath & trauma of the crime (s). We offer training and consultancy to communities, voluntary groups and professionals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £86,020 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bedford
- Cambridgeshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
- Luton
- Milton Keynes
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 02 February 2015: CIO registration
- THE HOPE PROGRAMME FORMERLY KNOWN AS LUTON RAPE CRISIS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda PARSONS | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR TIMOTHY PASCOE | Trustee | 11 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
R JOHN BARKER | Trustee | 11 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.09k | £137.06k | £145.45k | £145.00k | £91.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.60k | £103.60k | £125.06k | £87.00k | £84.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £119.16k | £96.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £137.06k | £101.20k | £24.15k | N/A | £86.02k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 02 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
• TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF, AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF VICTIMS OF SEXUAL VIOLENCE AND/OR SEXUAL ABUSE WHENEVER AND WHEREVER IT HAS OCCURRED, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS SO AS TO RELIEVE THEIR TRAUMA AND DISTRESS. • TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN THE SUBJECTS OF RAPE AND/OR SEXUAL VIOLENCE AND THE EFFECTS ON VICTIMS, SURVIVORS AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 CHARTWELL DRIVE
LUTON
LU2 7JD
- Phone:
- 07917733100
- Website:
-
hopeprogramme.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window