THE SAINT JOHNS SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds to assist in provision of education for young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 23 April 1976: Standard registration
- 09 March 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 25 May 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frances Crampton | Chair | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lesa Maria Jeffery | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Danielle May Goor | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Lucy | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.08k | £8.35k | £6.18k | £12.65k | £18.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.56k | £12.85k | £6.90k | £7.45k | £10.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 September 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 July 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED JANUARY 1976
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING ST. JOHNS SCHOOL BY PROVIDING, AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY AND ANCILLARY THERETO.
Area of benefit
SPALDING
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. JOHN THE BAPTIST SCHOOL
HAWTHORN BANK
SPALDING
LINCOLNSHIRE
PE11 1JQ
- Phone:
- 01775722644
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window