Financial history YORK CITY FOOTBALL CLUB FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1159325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £293.26k £297.06k £396.56k £488.62k £504.14k
Total expenditure £309.07k £279.80k £379.79k £487.05k £511.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £22.07k £21.23k £25.97k £75.29k £45.21k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £386.78k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £651
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £116.71k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £511.35k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0