SOCIOLOGICAL REVIEW FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charitable objects are ?To advance the education of the public in general (and particularly among students at the University of Keele) on the subject of sociology in such ways as the trustees think fit, including by awarding scholarships for students studying sociology and promoting research for the public benefit in all aspects of the subject of sociology and to publish the useful results.?
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 June 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR ROSEMARY DEEM | Chair | 02 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor Marie-Andree Jacob | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aaron Zave Winter | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Leslie Clifford Back | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karim Murji | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katrina Jungnickel | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chantelle Jessica Lewis | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Steven Dexter Brown | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas John Dark | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karen O'Reilly | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Featherstone | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR BEVERLEY ELIZABETH SKEGGS | Trustee | 02 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £213.49k | £197.61k | £186.17k | £147.19k | £210.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £246.82k | £197.42k | £244.04k | £277.02k | £311.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 MAY 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/05/2015 as amended on 12 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND PARTICULARLY AMONG STUDENTS AT THE UNIVERSITY OF KEELE) ON THE SUBJECT OF SOCIOLOGY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS FOR STUDENTS STUDYING SOCIOLOGY AND PROMOTING RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE SUBJECT OF SOCIOLOGY AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lancaster University
Bowland College
Bailrigg
LANCASTER
c/o Professor Michaela Benson
LA1 4YT
- Phone:
- +33749384199
- Email:
- operations@srfl.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window